+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 3.
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor