+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:30 p.m.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 11. Page 2587.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 19. Page 2585.)
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to the Assembly.
- Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2078.)
- Ordered to third reading.
- (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2067.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
On July 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Measure version as amended on June 21 corrected.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and APPR.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
- Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1969.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
- Coauthors revised.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and APPR.
On December 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
On December 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
July 17, 2017: ACA 1 MAYES Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 9
July 17, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading ACA1 Mayes By Roth
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 13
July 12, 2017: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
May 31, 2017: ACA 1 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
May 26, 2017: Be adopted.
- Yeas: 17
May 10, 2017: Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor