+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4916.)
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6422.)
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 21).
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
August 27, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AJR51 Brown By Mitchell
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
August 25, 2014: AJR 51 BROWN Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 79
August 21, 2014: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor