+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2022.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4843.)
On August 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0.)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 15).
On February 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended.
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (3)
August 16, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AJR23 Boerner Horvath et a By Skinner
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 23, 2022: AJR 23 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
March 15, 2022: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor