+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 60, Statutes of 2019.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1060.)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1355.)
- Coauthors revised.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22).
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2019: Special Consent ACR63
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2019: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (69)
Type:
Primary Sponsor