+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2021.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.)
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 963.)
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8).
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2021: Special Consent ACR50
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
April 8, 2021: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor