+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2019.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1679.)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2176.)
- Coauthors revised.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 30).
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
June 20, 2019: Special Consent ACR30
- Yeas: 40
May 30, 2019: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor