+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 72, Statutes of 2022.
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3843.)
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4520.)
- Coauthors revised.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2022: Special Consent ACR185
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
April 28, 2022: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (62)
Type:
Primary Sponsor