+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2022.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3584.)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4212.)
On March 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 31).
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR168
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
March 31, 2022: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor