+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30).
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
June 30, 2022: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor