+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2022.
On February 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2896.)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Amended. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 2770.)
- Coauthors revised.
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2770.)
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 2).
On August 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
On August 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Amended.
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
On August 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On August 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2022: Special Consent ACR105
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
September 2, 2021: Be adopted as amended.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor