+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On October 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 3131.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 2240.).
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 1760.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 10, 2013: AB 999 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 2
September 9, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB999 Bonta By Wright
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 4
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 29, 2013: AB 999 BONTA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 4
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
April 9, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor