+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 376, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2837.).
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2342.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 17).
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7).
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1563.)
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 14).
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and H. & C.D.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (14)
September 3, 2015: AB 999 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
September 1, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB999 Daly By Hill
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 17, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
July 7, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 7, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 23, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
June 23, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
May 22, 2015: AB 999 DALY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
May 22, 2015: AB 999 DALY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
May 13, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 29, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 29, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development]
- Yeas: 10
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development]
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor