+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1653.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 6, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
May 27, 2021: AB 998 Lackey Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 6, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor