+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 497, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3106.).
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2509.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On July 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.)
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 26).
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 9, 2019: AB 991 Gallagher Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 4, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB991 Gallagher By Borgeas
- Yeas: 40
July 2, 2019: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
April 1, 2019: AB 991 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
March 26, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 12
March 26, 2019: Do pass. To Consenyle="text-align:left"> Noes:
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor