+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
On August 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1).
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to the Com. on JUD.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., HOUSING and JUD.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 9. Page 1739.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28).
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (7)
August 23, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 8, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
July 1, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing]
- Yeas: 5
June 1, 2021: AB 989 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
April 28, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
April 15, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor