+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 11. Page 1785.)
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 28).
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 21).
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 2, 2015: AB 986 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor