+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On July 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1813.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 24).
On May 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On April 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
May 30, 2013: AB 985 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
April 30, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor