+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1176.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.)
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 11, 2019: AB 98 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor