+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On January 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
January 14, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor