+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 4989.).
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 21).
On June 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 3. Page 3344.)
On January 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 12).
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (4)
August 23, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB972 Berman By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 13, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2022: AB 972 Berman Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 19
January 12, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor