+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 458, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3115.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2259.).
On September 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 12).
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1577.)
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and PUB. S.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 10, 2013: AB 971 GARCIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
September 9, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB971 Garcia By De León
- Yeas: 39
August 12, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 25, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
May 23, 2013: AB 971 GARCIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
May 15, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 30, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor