+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 783, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 2773.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2300.).
On August 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22).
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 1475.)
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 22).
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 2, 2015: AB 970 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 2
August 31, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB970 Nazarian By Leyva
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 18, 2015: AB 970 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 6
April 22, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor