+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6040.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4985.).
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Held at Desk.
On January 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
- From inactive file.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Williams.
- Action rescinded whereby the Assembly concurred in Senate amendments.
- Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 5. Page 2560.).
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2111.).
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6).
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17).
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 11. Page 1480.)
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (May 6).
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 21).
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 15, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB969 Williams By Leyva
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
August 24, 2015: AB 969 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 10
August 20, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB969 Williams By Jackson
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
June 17, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 17, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 18, 2015: AB 969 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 10
May 6, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 2
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor