+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 815, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 3160.).
On September 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2605.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 10).
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 16. Page 2081.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 16).
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On March 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 9, 2019: AB 962 Burke Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 7
September 6, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB962 Burke et al. By Bradford
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 10, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2019: AB 962 Burke Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 9
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
April 2, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor