+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1400.)
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1314.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.)
- Ordered to second reading.
- (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1312.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
On January 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
May 13, 2013: AB 96 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (14)
Committee on Budget
Type:
Primary Sponsor