+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
March 26, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor