+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Pan.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5).
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 28. Page 2057.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26).
- Coauthors revised.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 20, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
July 5, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 1, 2017: AB 958 TING Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 8
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 6
April 25, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor