+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 53, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:40 p.m.
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2105.).
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1339.).
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4).
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1043.)
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 20, 2013: AB 957 WAGNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
June 13, 2013: Consent Calendar 2nd AB957 Wagner
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
April 22, 2013: AB 957 WAGNER Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2013: Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor