+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 29, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On September 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 14, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 3123.).
On September 7, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.)
On September 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2402.).
On August 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 13).
On June 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On March 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 13. Page 998.)
On March 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 21).
On March 14, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On February 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (4)
September 8, 2023: AB 957 Wilson Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 3
September 6, 2023: Assembly 3rd Reading AB957 Wilson et al. By Umberg
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
March 30, 2023: AB 957 Wilson Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 16
March 21, 2023: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor