+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 232, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2797.).
On August 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2205.).
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4).
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1637.)
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30).
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On March 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and P. & C.P.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 22, 2019: AB 956 Diep Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 19, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB956 Diep et al. By Umberg
- Yeas: 40
June 4, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
May 13, 2019: AB 956 Diep Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
April 30, 2019: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
April 24, 2019: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 5