+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 6
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor