+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died on inactive file.
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Ammiano.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 8).
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor