+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 771, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3331.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2404.).
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1693.)
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 12, 2013: AB 952 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
September 12, 2013: Special Consent #10 AB952 Atkins By DeSaulnier
- Yeas: 39
August 26, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
August 14, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2013: Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 29, 2013: AB 952 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
May 13, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
April 3, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor