+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 4).
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 4, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor