+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor