+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 529, Statutes of 2021.
On September 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2976.).
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2516.).
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From special consent calendar.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 13).
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1540.)
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1428.)
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27).
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (4)
September 9, 2021: AB 939 Cervantes Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB939 Cervantes et al. By Rubio
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
May 24, 2021: AB 939 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 3
April 27, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor