+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 667, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2748.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.)
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2310.).
On August 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14).
On July 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1016.)
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 14).
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 1, 2015: AB 939 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 31, 2015: Special Consent #8 AB939 Salas
- Yeas: 40
July 14, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 9
April 20, 2015: AB 939 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 80
April 20, 2015: AB 939 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 80
April 14, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor