+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
On March 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
May 6, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor