+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 4654.).
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 1782.)
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1507.)
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 7).
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 20, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB938 Weber By Block
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 8
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2013: AB 938 WEBER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
May 7, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor