+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1645.)
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 9).
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 2).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2017: AB 937 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
May 9, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 11