+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 13. Page 5423.).
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 21. Page 1906.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20).
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 20).
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (7)
August 31, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB937 Carrillo et al. By Wiener
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 9
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 13, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 3, 2021: AB 937 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 16
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
April 6, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor