+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 127, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:40 p.m.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 1688.).
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 11).
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 3. Page 1452.)
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 7).
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 8, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB937 Wieckowski By Wolk
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
June 11, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 16, 2013: AB 937 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 8
May 7, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor