+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (37)
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 770, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 10. Page 3487.).
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2863.).
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (September 10)
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 25).
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 19. Page 1978.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 8).
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 12, 2019: AB 936 Robert Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 9
September 11, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB936 Robert Rivas et al. By Wiener
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
September 10, 2019: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
August 30, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 3, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2019: AB 936 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 16
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
April 8, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3