+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 644, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6465.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.)
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4826.).
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 1334.)
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 1).
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 26, 2014: AB 935 FRAZIER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 25, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB935 Frazier By Roth
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2013: AB 935 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 9
May 1, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 10, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor