+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1507.)
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 6, 2019: AB 932 Low Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
April 24, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
April 3, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor