+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2919.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2915.)
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2457.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1689.)
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18).
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 4, 2015: AB 931 IRWIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
September 3, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB931 Irwin By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 8, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
July 8, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 1, 2015: AB 931 IRWIN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
May 18, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 18, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor