+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 813, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 13. Page 3157.).
On September 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2564.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 9).
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 19).
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 11. Page 1974.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 16).
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
- Coauthors revised.
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and A. & A.R.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 9, 2019: AB 931 Boerner Horvath Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 6
September 5, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB931 Boerner Horvath By Skinner
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
August 19, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
July 9, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 19, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2019: AB 931 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 11
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
April 3, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor