+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 5. Page 3237.).
On September 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2562.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 30).
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 2. Page 1877.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 10, 2019: AB 927 Jones-Sawyer Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 11
September 5, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB927 Jones-Sawyer By Wiener
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
July 1, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 18, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 23, 2019: AB 927 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 16
May 16, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 2
April 2, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor