+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and L. GOV.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 26, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor